THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:22:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-273-4100
Extension: 6
Fax: 519-273-3208

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allison V. Hobbs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hobbs (CPSO#: 100176 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-273-4100
Extension: 6
Fax: 519-273-3208

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allison V. Hobbs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hobbs (CPSO#: 100176 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON VICTORIA HOBBS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOBBS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON VICTORIA HOBBS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOBBS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2013