THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:43:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-4790
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 525 Causley St., P.O. Box 970
Blind River Ontario P0R1B0
Phone: (705) 356-2265
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Larch Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1C5
Phone: (705) 673-3721
Fax: (705) 805-3660

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 25 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dominique R. Ansell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ansell (CPSO#: 100182 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 525 Causley Street
P O Box 970
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-4790
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 525 Causley St., P.O. Box 970
Blind River Ontario P0R1B0
Phone: (705) 356-2265
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Larch Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1C5
Phone: (705) 673-3721
Fax: (705) 805-3660

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 25 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dominique R. Ansell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ansell (CPSO#: 100182 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 525 Causley Street
P O Box 970
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMINIQUE RENEE ANSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMINIQUE RENEE ANSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013