THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:02:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1485 Heron Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 6A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mazen Younes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Younes (CPSO#: 100186 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: Russel Meadows Retirement Community
475 Church Street
Russell Ontario K4R 0A9
(613) 445-5200
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1485 Heron Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 6A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mazen Younes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Younes (CPSO#: 100186 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: Russel Meadows Retirement Community
475 Church Street
Russell Ontario K4R 0A9
(613) 445-5200
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAZEN YOUNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAZEN YOUNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013