THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:26:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Tecnol¢gica de Pereira, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 876-5056
Fax: 2896702176
Address: 26 Legend Court
unit 3-4
Hamilton Ontario L9K 1J3
Phone: (905) 304-8881
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 05 Nov 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giraldo Salazar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Giraldo Salazar (CPSO#: 100189 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Tecnol¢gica de Pereira, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 876-5056
Fax: 2896702176
Address: 26 Legend Court
unit 3-4
Hamilton Ontario L9K 1J3
Phone: (905) 304-8881
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 05 Nov 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giraldo Salazar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Giraldo Salazar (CPSO#: 100189 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIANA GIRALDO SALAZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRALDO SALAZAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIANA GIRALDO SALAZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRALDO SALAZAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Tecnol¢gica de Pereira, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013