THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:26:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5929 Jeanne D'Arc Blvd South
Suite 1924
Ottawa ON K1C 6V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 749-5421
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jul 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: YINGWEI LIU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Liu (CPSO#: 100194 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
613-746-4621
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
613-721-2000
Business Address: 211 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place ON K7C 1J4
613-257-2200
Business Address: 5929 Jeanne d'Arc Blvd S
Suite 1924
Orléans ON K1C 6V8
(613) 749-5421
Business Address: 1355 Bank St
Suite 502
Ottawa Cardiovascular Centre
Ottawa ON K1H 8K7
(613) 738-1584

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5929 Jeanne D'Arc Blvd South
Suite 1924
Ottawa ON K1C 6V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 749-5421
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jul 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: YINGWEI LIU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Liu (CPSO#: 100194 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
613-746-4621
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
613-721-2000
Business Address: 211 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place ON K7C 1J4
613-257-2200
Business Address: 5929 Jeanne d'Arc Blvd S
Suite 1924
Orléans ON K1C 6V8
(613) 749-5421
Business Address: 1355 Bank St
Suite 502
Ottawa Cardiovascular Centre
Ottawa ON K1H 8K7
(613) 738-1584

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YINGWEI LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YINGWEI LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013