THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:03:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bayview Medical Centre
37 The Links rd
North York Ontario M2P 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 730-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bayview Medical Centre
37 The Links rd
North York Ontario M2P 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 730-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BAHAR AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BAHAR AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 May 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 May 2013