THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:41:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3111
Fax: (416) 340-4896
Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T2S8
Phone: 416-603-5757
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue, East York
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 40 Holly Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C3
Phone: 416-486-8088
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 25 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 09 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Soojin L. Yi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yi (CPSO#: 100204 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Emergency Department
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5757
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3946
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3111
Fax: (416) 340-4896
Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T2S8
Phone: 416-603-5757
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue, East York
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 40 Holly Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C3
Phone: 416-486-8088
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 25 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 09 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Soojin L. Yi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yi (CPSO#: 100204 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Emergency Department
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5757
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3946
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOOJIN LESLIE YI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOOJIN LESLIE YI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2013