THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:33:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Queensway Carleton Geriatric Day Hospital
2039 Robertson Rd
Suite 100
Nepean ON K2H 8R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-3808
Fax: 613-721-4767

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jamie Ray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ray (CPSO#: 100218 )
Business Address: The Queensway Carlton Geriatric Day Hospital
2039 Robertson Rd
Suite 100
Nepean ON K2H 8R2
613-721-3808

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Queensway Carleton Geriatric Day Hospital
2039 Robertson Rd
Suite 100
Nepean ON K2H 8R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-3808
Fax: 613-721-4767

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jamie Ray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ray (CPSO#: 100218 )
Business Address: The Queensway Carlton Geriatric Day Hospital
2039 Robertson Rd
Suite 100
Nepean ON K2H 8R2
613-721-3808

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMIE NICOLE CALHOUN RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMIE NICOLE CALHOUN RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013