THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 16:53:28 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Infectious Diseases
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 210 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 680-9092
Fax: 6136809093

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nigam Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sharma (CPSO#: 100220 ) Dr. A. Nigam (CPSO#: 108089 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Infectious Diseases
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 210 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 680-9092
Fax: 6136809093

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nigam Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sharma (CPSO#: 100220 ) Dr. A. Nigam (CPSO#: 108089 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARAN SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARAN SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2013