THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:06:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 51 Parkway (the)
ActiveCare Medical Clinic Beaverbrook
Kanata ON K2K 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6133197996
Fax: 6132718998
Address: Weeneebayko General Hospital
19 Hospital Dr
Moose Factory, ON
P0L 1W0
Moose Factory Ontario P0L1W0
Phone: 7056584544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan St N
Renfrew, ON
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-4851
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Aug 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elvin Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tan (CPSO#: 100224 )
Business Address: 51 Parkway (the)
ActiveCare Medical Clinics
Kanata ON K2K 1T1
6133197996
Business Address: Active Care Medical Centre
Unit A
1108 Klondike Road
Ottawa Ontario K2K 0G1
(613) 254-9701

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 51 Parkway (the)
ActiveCare Medical Clinic Beaverbrook
Kanata ON K2K 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6133197996
Fax: 6132718998
Address: Weeneebayko General Hospital
19 Hospital Dr
Moose Factory, ON
P0L 1W0
Moose Factory Ontario P0L1W0
Phone: 7056584544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan St N
Renfrew, ON
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-4851
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Aug 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elvin Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tan (CPSO#: 100224 )
Business Address: 51 Parkway (the)
ActiveCare Medical Clinics
Kanata ON K2K 1T1
6133197996
Business Address: Active Care Medical Centre
Unit A
1108 Klondike Road
Ottawa Ontario K2K 0G1
(613) 254-9701

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELVIN YAN-ZHANG TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELVIN YAN-ZHANG TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013