THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 01:25:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 118-5045 Mainway
Burlington Ontario L7L 5Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 315-7007
Fax: (289) 714-2516
Address: 118-5045 Mainway
Burlington Ontario L7L 5Z1
Phone: (905) 315-7007
Fax: (905) 315-8009
Address: 1 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: (905) 338-4146
Address: Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ted Jackson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Jackson (CPSO#: 100240 )
Business Address: Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
(905) 873-0111
Business Address: Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: 118-5045 Mainway
Burlington ON L7L 5H9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 118-5045 Mainway
Burlington Ontario L7L 5Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 315-7007
Fax: (289) 714-2516
Address: 118-5045 Mainway
Burlington Ontario L7L 5Z1
Phone: (905) 315-7007
Fax: (905) 315-8009
Address: 1 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: (905) 338-4146
Address: Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ted Jackson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Jackson (CPSO#: 100240 )
Business Address: Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
(905) 873-0111
Business Address: Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: 118-5045 Mainway
Burlington ON L7L 5H9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TED GRANT JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TED GRANT JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013