THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:38:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Pediatric General and Thoracic Surgery
1526 Hill Wing
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
Wilson Site
Toronto, ON
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Surgery
Effective: 17 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 23 Apr 2019

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M Pilkington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pilkington (CPSO#: 100255 )
Business Address: 175 Elizabeth Street
Hospital for Sick Children
PSC-09-14-052
Toronto Ontario M5G 2G3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Pediatric General and Thoracic Surgery
1526 Hill Wing
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
Wilson Site
Toronto, ON
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Surgery
Effective: 17 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 23 Apr 2019

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M Pilkington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pilkington (CPSO#: 100255 )
Business Address: 175 Elizabeth Street
Hospital for Sick Children
PSC-09-14-052
Toronto Ontario M5G 2G3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERCEDES MARION ALICE PILKINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILKINGTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERCEDES MARION ALICE PILKINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILKINGTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013