THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:32:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
211
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165510659
Fax: 6476897608
Address: North Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 1A3
Phone: 905 946 0222
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 301-40 Holly St
Toronto ON M4S 3C3
Phone: (416) 486-8088
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 04 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian P Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chan (CPSO#: 100258 )
Business Address: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 510
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 438-2911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
211
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165510659
Fax: 6476897608
Address: North Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 1A3
Phone: 905 946 0222
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 301-40 Holly St
Toronto ON M4S 3C3
Phone: (416) 486-8088
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 04 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian P Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chan (CPSO#: 100258 )
Business Address: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 510
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 438-2911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN PAK HO CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN PAK HO CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013