THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:43:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3
35 Bridge Street
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 476-7771
Fax: 613-471-1493

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Le Blanc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Le Blanc (CPSO#: 100261 )
Business Address: Sandbanks Medical Centre
12 Prince Edward Drive
Wellington Ontario K0K 3L0
(613) 399-1281
Business Address: 35 Bridge Street
Unit 6
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
(613) 476-6661
Business Address: Prince Edward County Memorial Hospital
403 Picton Main Street
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
(613) 476-1008

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3
35 Bridge Street
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 476-7771
Fax: 613-471-1493

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Le Blanc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Le Blanc (CPSO#: 100261 )
Business Address: Sandbanks Medical Centre
12 Prince Edward Drive
Wellington Ontario K0K 3L0
(613) 399-1281
Business Address: 35 Bridge Street
Unit 6
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
(613) 476-6661
Business Address: Prince Edward County Memorial Hospital
403 Picton Main Street
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
(613) 476-1008

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH LE BLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE BLANC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH LE BLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE BLANC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013