THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:39:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 316
1235 Trafalgar Rd
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-9233
Fax: (905) 582-0888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Makhzoum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Makhzoum (CPSO#: 100274 )
Business Address: 1235 Trafalgar Road
Suite 316
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 316
1235 Trafalgar Rd
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-9233
Fax: (905) 582-0888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Makhzoum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Makhzoum (CPSO#: 100274 )
Business Address: 1235 Trafalgar Road
Suite 316
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANAS MAKHZOUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKHZOUM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANAS MAKHZOUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKHZOUM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013