THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 02:11:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 86 Angeline St S
Suite 201
Lindsay Ontario K9V 6C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-320-7616
Fax: 705-320-8812
Address: 86 Angeline St S
Suite 201
Lindsay ON K9V 6C5
Phone: 705-320-7616
Fax: 705-320-8812

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. C. CONLIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Conlin (CPSO#: 100276 )
Business Address: 86 Angeline St S
Suite 201
Lindsay ON K9V 6C5

Corporation Name: DR. C. CONLIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Nov 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 86 Angeline St S
Suite 201
Lindsay Ontario K9V 6C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-320-7616
Fax: 705-320-8812
Address: 86 Angeline St S
Suite 201
Lindsay ON K9V 6C5
Phone: 705-320-7616
Fax: 705-320-8812

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. C. CONLIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Conlin (CPSO#: 100276 )
Business Address: 86 Angeline St S
Suite 201
Lindsay ON K9V 6C5

Corporation Name: DR. C. CONLIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Nov 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELLEN CONLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONLIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELLEN CONLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONLIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013