THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 18:15:22 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lake Shore Blvd
Emergency Department
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056323737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MUHAMMAD A. FURQAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Furqan (CPSO#: 100280 ) Dr. A. Haroon (CPSO#: 101153 )
Business Address: 152 Wheat Boom Dr

Corporation Name: Muhammad A. Furqan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lake Shore Blvd
Emergency Department
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056323737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MUHAMMAD A. FURQAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Furqan (CPSO#: 100280 ) Dr. A. Haroon (CPSO#: 101153 )
Business Address: 152 Wheat Boom Dr

Corporation Name: Muhammad A. Furqan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD ALI FURQAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURQAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD ALI FURQAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURQAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013