THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:41:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 York St
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163505900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 York St
Medcan
Toronto ON M4I 3Y7
Phone: 416-350-5900
Fax: 416-350-5981

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Zelovitzky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zelovitzky (CPSO#: 100298 )
Business Address: 150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
4163505900

Corporation Name: Jennifer Zelovitzky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zelovitzky (CPSO#: 100298 )
Business Address: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Hospital-Odette Centre
Gynaecology Oncology
Toronto ON M4N 3M5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 York St
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163505900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 York St
Medcan
Toronto ON M4I 3Y7
Phone: 416-350-5900
Fax: 416-350-5981

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Zelovitzky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zelovitzky (CPSO#: 100298 )
Business Address: 150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
4163505900

Corporation Name: Jennifer Zelovitzky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zelovitzky (CPSO#: 100298 )
Business Address: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Hospital-Odette Centre
Gynaecology Oncology
Toronto ON M4N 3M5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER HOPE ZELOVITZKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZELOVITZKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER HOPE ZELOVITZKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZELOVITZKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013