THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:30:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-876-5056
Fax: 289-670-2176

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Humaira Nael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Nael (CPSO#: 100319 )
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2383
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: Treehouse Pediatrics
302-10 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9M2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-876-5056
Fax: 289-670-2176

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Humaira Nael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Nael (CPSO#: 100319 )
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2383
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: Treehouse Pediatrics
302-10 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9M2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUMAIRA NAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUMAIRA NAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013