THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:59:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health For All Family Health Team
Markham Family Teaching Unit
379 Church Street, #202
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-2200
Fax: 905-472-5662

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly M. Forse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Forse (CPSO#: 100330 )
Business Address: 379 Church Street, Suite #202
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
905-472-2200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health For All Family Health Team
Markham Family Teaching Unit
379 Church Street, #202
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-2200
Fax: 905-472-5662

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly M. Forse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Forse (CPSO#: 100330 )
Business Address: 379 Church Street, Suite #202
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
905-472-2200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY MONIQUE FORSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY MONIQUE FORSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013