THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:59:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Walker Family Cancer Centre
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 682-6451
Fax: (905) 682-3391

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Phillips & Ho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ho (CPSO#: 104074 ) Dr. C. Phillips (CPSO#: 100342 )
Business Address: Walker Family Cancer Centre
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 682-6451
Business Address: 155 Highway 20 West
Fonthill Ontario L0S 1E5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Walker Family Cancer Centre
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 682-6451
Fax: (905) 682-3391

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Phillips & Ho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ho (CPSO#: 104074 ) Dr. C. Phillips (CPSO#: 100342 )
Business Address: Walker Family Cancer Centre
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 682-6451
Business Address: 155 Highway 20 West
Fonthill Ontario L0S 1E5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMERON PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMERON PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013