THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:10:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-8452571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Grand River Hosptal
835 King St. W
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: 5197494300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2460 Truscott Dr
Mississauga ON L5J 3Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hasif Hakim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hakim (CPSO#: 100343 )
Business Address: St Marys General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1B2
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
905-845-2571

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-8452571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Grand River Hosptal
835 King St. W
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: 5197494300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2460 Truscott Dr
Mississauga ON L5J 3Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hasif Hakim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hakim (CPSO#: 100343 )
Business Address: St Marys General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1B2
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
905-845-2571

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASIF RASHIQUL HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASIF RASHIQUL HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013