THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:48:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10376 Yonge St
Universal Heart Centre
Unit 303
Richmond Hill ON L4C 3B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055089090
Fax: 9057700799

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arastoo Mokhtari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mokhtari (CPSO#: 100344 )
Business Address: Universal Heart Centre
10376 Yonge St
Unit 303
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3B8
9055089090

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10376 Yonge St
Universal Heart Centre
Unit 303
Richmond Hill ON L4C 3B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055089090
Fax: 9057700799

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arastoo Mokhtari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mokhtari (CPSO#: 100344 )
Business Address: Universal Heart Centre
10376 Yonge St
Unit 303
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3B8
9055089090

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARASTOO MOKHTARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOKHTARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARASTOO MOKHTARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOKHTARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013