THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:22:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Charlton campus level 0
50 Charlton ave east
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 36009
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Victoria Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tan (CPSO#: 100349 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Charlton campus level 0
50 Charlton ave east
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 36009
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Victoria Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tan (CPSO#: 100349 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013