THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:19:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queens Blvd
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-435 King St N
Waterloo ON N2J 2Z5
Phone: 5196030657
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Colin Yardley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yardley (CPSO#: 100353 )
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queens Blvd
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-435 King St N
Waterloo ON N2J 2Z5
Phone: 5196030657
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Colin Yardley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yardley (CPSO#: 100353 )
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLIN JAMES YARDLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YARDLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLIN JAMES YARDLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YARDLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013