THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:39:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortelucci Vaughan Hospital
Emergency Department
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashu Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jain (CPSO#: 100357 )
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health Hospital
Emergency Department
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Address: University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
R.Fraser Elliott Building-Room 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3856

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortelucci Vaughan Hospital
Emergency Department
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashu Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jain (CPSO#: 100357 )
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health Hospital
Emergency Department
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Address: University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
R.Fraser Elliott Building-Room 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3856

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHU NITIN JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHU NITIN JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013