THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:35:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 461 Holland St W
Bradford Ontario L3Z 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-775-5327
Fax: 905-775-0693
Address: Pickering College
Student Health Centre
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4X2
Phone: 905-895-1700
Extension: 248
Fax: 905-895-1052

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Philippines

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. De Manuel Enriquez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Enriquez (CPSO#: 100407 )
Business Address: 16945 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4X2
(905) 895-1700
Business Address: 461 Holland Street West
Bradford Ontario L3Z 0C1
(905) 775-5327

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 461 Holland St W
Bradford Ontario L3Z 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-775-5327
Fax: 905-775-0693
Address: Pickering College
Student Health Centre
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4X2
Phone: 905-895-1700
Extension: 248
Fax: 905-895-1052

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Philippines

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. De Manuel Enriquez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Enriquez (CPSO#: 100407 )
Business Address: 16945 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4X2
(905) 895-1700
Business Address: 461 Holland Street West
Bradford Ontario L3Z 0C1
(905) 775-5327

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN DE MANUEL ENRIQUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENRIQUEZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN DE MANUEL ENRIQUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENRIQUEZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013