THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:53:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto, ON
M5B 1X1
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-360-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. EVELYN DELL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Dell (CPSO#: 100429 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Emergency Department
Toronto ON M5B 1W8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto, ON
M5B 1X1
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-360-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. EVELYN DELL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Dell (CPSO#: 100429 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Emergency Department
Toronto ON M5B 1W8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVELYN MARION DELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVELYN MARION DELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013