THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:38:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Surgery
Division of Orthopaedics
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135496666
Extension: 2254
Fax: 6135481306
Address: Foothills Medical Centre
1403 29 St NW
Calgary Alberta T2N 2T9
Phone: (403) 944-1110
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 John Marks Avenue
Kingston Orthopaedic Pain Institute (KOPI)
Kingston Ontario K7K 7G2
Phone: 6135077246
Extension: 112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Cornelia St W
Perth & Smiths Falls District Hospital
Department of Surgery
Smiths Falls ON K7A 2H9
Phone: 6132832330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faizal Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kassam (CPSO#: 100459 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart Street
Victory 3
Department of Surgery
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
6135496666 Extn: 2254

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Surgery
Division of Orthopaedics
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135496666
Extension: 2254
Fax: 6135481306
Address: Foothills Medical Centre
1403 29 St NW
Calgary Alberta T2N 2T9
Phone: (403) 944-1110
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 John Marks Avenue
Kingston Orthopaedic Pain Institute (KOPI)
Kingston Ontario K7K 7G2
Phone: 6135077246
Extension: 112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Cornelia St W
Perth & Smiths Falls District Hospital
Department of Surgery
Smiths Falls ON K7A 2H9
Phone: 6132832330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faizal Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kassam (CPSO#: 100459 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart Street
Victory 3
Department of Surgery
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
6135496666 Extn: 2254

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAIZAL KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAIZAL KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013