THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:12:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jawaharlal Inst Postgraduate Med Educ, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Medical Centre
Suite 470
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 344-8475
Fax: (807) 344-6323

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Feb 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 04 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Madhu Azad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Azad (CPSO#: 100464 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Medical Centre
Suite 470
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4Z6
(807) 344-8475

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jawaharlal Inst Postgraduate Med Educ, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Medical Centre
Suite 470
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 344-8475
Fax: (807) 344-6323

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Feb 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 04 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Madhu Azad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Azad (CPSO#: 100464 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Medical Centre
Suite 470
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4Z6
(807) 344-8475

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADHU SANJAY AZAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADHU SANJAY AZAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jawaharlal Inst Postgraduate Med Educ, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 May 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 May 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 May 2013