THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:34:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford General Hospital
General Surgery Clinic
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-273-4100
Fax: 519-273-3208

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tyler Parrington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Parrington (CPSO#: 100479 )
Business Address: 2462 Howard Ave
Windsor ON N8X 3V6
2266744120
Business Address: 46 General Hospital Drive
General Surgery Offices
4th Floor
Stratford Ontario N5A 1J7
519-273-4100 Extn: 6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford General Hospital
General Surgery Clinic
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-273-4100
Fax: 519-273-3208

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tyler Parrington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Parrington (CPSO#: 100479 )
Business Address: 2462 Howard Ave
Windsor ON N8X 3V6
2266744120
Business Address: 46 General Hospital Drive
General Surgery Offices
4th Floor
Stratford Ontario N5A 1J7
519-273-4100 Extn: 6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TYLER ROSS PARRINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARRINGTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TYLER ROSS PARRINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARRINGTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2013