THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:30:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: M002-55 University Ave
Toronto ON M5J 2H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 426 722 3393
Fax: 416 342 0808

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Menna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Menna (CPSO#: 100484 )
Business Address: 55 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5J 2H7
4167223393

Corporation Name: J. Menna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: M002-55 University Ave
Toronto ON M5J 2H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 426 722 3393
Fax: 416 342 0808

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Menna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Menna (CPSO#: 100484 )
Business Address: 55 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5J 2H7
4167223393

Corporation Name: J. Menna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH DANIEL MENNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENNA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH DANIEL MENNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENNA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013