THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:11:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Upstate Medical Center State Univ of N Y, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 1217
Wawa ON P0S 1K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169395770
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Chapleau Health Services Chapleau
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: Chapleau Health Services
LOCATION: Chapleau

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Lady Dunn Health Centre
LOCATION: Wawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.H. Park Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Park (CPSO#: 100504 )
Business Address: Wawa Family Health Team
17 Government Road
Wawa Ontario P0S 1K0
(705) 856-1313

Corporation Name: Jun Park Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Upstate Medical Center State Univ of N Y, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 1217
Wawa ON P0S 1K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169395770
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Chapleau Health Services Chapleau
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: Chapleau Health Services
LOCATION: Chapleau

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Lady Dunn Health Centre
LOCATION: Wawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.H. Park Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Park (CPSO#: 100504 )
Business Address: Wawa Family Health Team
17 Government Road
Wawa Ontario P0S 1K0
(705) 856-1313

Corporation Name: Jun Park Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUN HYONG PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUN HYONG PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Upstate Medical Center State Univ of N Y, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013