THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:45:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Zagreb, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: One Heart Care
1000 Middlegate Rd
2nd floor
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 804-7000
Fax: (905) 804-2250
Address: 906 Sheppard Avenue West
Downsview Clinic Cardiology and Ultrasound
Unit 6
Toronto Ontario M3H 2T5
Phone: 4166330045
Fax: 4166330048

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MIA BERTIC MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bertic (CPSO#: 100506 )
Business Address: 1000 Middlegate Rd
2nd Floor
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M3
905 804 7000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN
Medical School: University of Zagreb, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: One Heart Care
1000 Middlegate Rd
2nd floor
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 804-7000
Fax: (905) 804-2250
Address: 906 Sheppard Avenue West
Downsview Clinic Cardiology and Ultrasound
Unit 6
Toronto Ontario M3H 2T5
Phone: 4166330045
Fax: 4166330048

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MIA BERTIC MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bertic (CPSO#: 100506 )
Business Address: 1000 Middlegate Rd
2nd Floor
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M3
905 804 7000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIA BERTIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIA BERTIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Zagreb, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013