THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:46:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sadaf Memon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Memon (CPSO#: 100510 )
Business Address: 2425 Matheson Boulevard East
Mississauga Ontario L4W 5K4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sadaf Memon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Memon (CPSO#: 100510 )
Business Address: 2425 Matheson Boulevard East
Mississauga Ontario L4W 5K4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SADAF SHAUKAT MEMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEMON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SADAF SHAUKAT MEMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEMON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013