THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C A M H Addiction Medicine Service
Bell Gateway Building
3rd Floor
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 32394
Fax: (416) 595-6821

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nikki Bozinoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bozinoff (CPSO#: 100518 )
Business Address: C A M H Addiction Medicine Service
Bell Gateway Building
3rd Floor
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 32394

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C A M H Addiction Medicine Service
Bell Gateway Building
3rd Floor
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 32394
Fax: (416) 595-6821

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nikki Bozinoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bozinoff (CPSO#: 100518 )
Business Address: C A M H Addiction Medicine Service
Bell Gateway Building
3rd Floor
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 32394

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIKKI BOZINOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOZINOFF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIKKI BOZINOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOZINOFF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013