THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:32:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-223-0555
Fax: 416-223-0540

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Josephine Dunston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dunston (CPSO#: 100519 )
Business Address: 401-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
416-223-0555
Business Address: 77 Provost Drive
Toronto Ontario M2K 0B7
(416) 901-7407
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000
Business Address: 501-1110 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2K 2W2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-223-0555
Fax: 416-223-0540

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Josephine Dunston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dunston (CPSO#: 100519 )
Business Address: 401-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
416-223-0555
Business Address: 77 Provost Drive
Toronto Ontario M2K 0B7
(416) 901-7407
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000
Business Address: 501-1110 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2K 2W2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPHINE SHARLINI DUNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNSTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPHINE SHARLINI DUNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNSTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013