THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 15:50:55 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: office records can be accessed by calling:
Phone: 519-948-7550
Address: 2525 Roseville Garden Drive, Windsor, Ontario, N8T 3J8
Date Received: 11 Feb 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Parashar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Parashar (CPSO#: 100520 ) Dr. S. Parashar (CPSO#: 71996 )
Business Address: 2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
(519) 948-7550

Corporation Name: R. Parashar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Parashar (CPSO#: 100520 ) Dr. R. Parashar (CPSO#: 68704 )
Business Address: Suite 258
1720 Howard Avenue, 400 Building
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
(519) 252-4049
Business Address: 320 Elmgrove Dr
Windsor ON N8N 3S4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: office records can be accessed by calling:
Phone: 519-948-7550
Address: 2525 Roseville Garden Drive, Windsor, Ontario, N8T 3J8
Date Received: 11 Feb 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Parashar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Parashar (CPSO#: 100520 ) Dr. S. Parashar (CPSO#: 71996 )
Business Address: 2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
(519) 948-7550

Corporation Name: R. Parashar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Parashar (CPSO#: 100520 ) Dr. R. Parashar (CPSO#: 68704 )
Business Address: Suite 258
1720 Howard Avenue, 400 Building
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
(519) 252-4049
Business Address: 320 Elmgrove Dr
Windsor ON N8N 3S4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHA PARASHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARASHAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHA PARASHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARASHAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013