THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:57:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brameast Family Physicians
Unit 38
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 792-2211
Fax: 905-792-2901

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine J. Cho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cho (CPSO#: 100531 )
Business Address: 38-2130 North Park Dr
Brampton ON L6S 0C9
9057922211

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brameast Family Physicians
Unit 38
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 792-2211
Fax: 905-792-2901

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine J. Cho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cho (CPSO#: 100531 )
Business Address: 38-2130 North Park Dr
Brampton ON L6S 0C9
9057922211

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE JOONYOUNG CHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE JOONYOUNG CHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013