THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:28:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Hospitalist Medicine
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Fax: 519-751-5502

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Egypt
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brantford General Hospital Brantford
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Brantford General Hospital
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.A.KAMEL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kamel (CPSO#: 100546 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Hospital Medicine
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
519 751 5544
Business Address: 610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
905 979 9677

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Hospitalist Medicine
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Fax: 519-751-5502

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Egypt
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brantford General Hospital Brantford
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Brantford General Hospital
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.A.KAMEL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kamel (CPSO#: 100546 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Hospital Medicine
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
519 751 5544
Business Address: 610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
905 979 9677

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOLIMAN ASAAD KAMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOLIMAN ASAAD KAMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Nov 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013