THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:54:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Storybrook Medical Clinic
611 Wanless Dr, unit 1
Brampton Ontario L7A 3Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-840-2008
Fax: 905-840-2002
Address: 157 Yonge St
Toronto ON M5C 1X7
Phone: 416-362-8822
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Jul 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Kahlon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sharma (CPSO#: 100549 ) Dr. P. Kahlon (CPSO#: 100767 )
Business Address: Storybook Medical Clinic
611 Wanless Drive
Unit 1
Brampton Ontario L7A 3Y6
(905) 840-2008

Corporation Name: Dr. Vinay Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sharma (CPSO#: 100549 ) Dr. P. Kahlon (CPSO#: 100767 )
Business Address: Storybrook Medical Clinic
611 Wanless Drive
Unit 1
Brampton Ontario L6A 3Y6
(905) 840-2008

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Storybrook Medical Clinic
611 Wanless Dr, unit 1
Brampton Ontario L7A 3Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-840-2008
Fax: 905-840-2002
Address: 157 Yonge St
Toronto ON M5C 1X7
Phone: 416-362-8822
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Jul 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Kahlon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sharma (CPSO#: 100549 ) Dr. P. Kahlon (CPSO#: 100767 )
Business Address: Storybook Medical Clinic
611 Wanless Drive
Unit 1
Brampton Ontario L7A 3Y6
(905) 840-2008

Corporation Name: Dr. Vinay Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sharma (CPSO#: 100549 ) Dr. P. Kahlon (CPSO#: 100767 )
Business Address: Storybrook Medical Clinic
611 Wanless Drive
Unit 1
Brampton Ontario L6A 3Y6
(905) 840-2008

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Jan 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 29 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vinay Sharma may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vinay Sharma may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2013