THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:42:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 17057432121
Extension: 2684
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 80 Maritime Ontario Boulevard
,, ON L6S 0E7
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E7
Phone: 5068745455
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 04 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ismail Sharif Medicine Professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Sharif (CPSO#: 100550 )
Business Address: 1741 Shelburne St
Oshawa ON L1K 0S9
Business Address: 1741 Shelburne St
Oshawa ON L1K 0S9
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(905) 740-8326

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 17057432121
Extension: 2684
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 80 Maritime Ontario Boulevard
,, ON L6S 0E7
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E7
Phone: 5068745455
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 04 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ismail Sharif Medicine Professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Sharif (CPSO#: 100550 )
Business Address: 1741 Shelburne St
Oshawa ON L1K 0S9
Business Address: 1741 Shelburne St
Oshawa ON L1K 0S9
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(905) 740-8326

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISMAIL ABDELWAHAB SHARIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARIF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISMAIL ABDELWAHAB SHARIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARIF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 May 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2013