THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:12:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Bronte St South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-876-7606
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237 Barton St. East.
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pervaiz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Pervaiz (CPSO#: 100552 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Bronte St South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-876-7606
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237 Barton St. East.
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pervaiz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Pervaiz (CPSO#: 100552 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARHAN PERVAIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERVAIZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARHAN PERVAIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERVAIZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013