THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 07:38:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
Department of Family Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 340 York Blvd
Hamilton Ontario L8R 3L2
Phone: (905) 525-1677
Fax: 905 525 5112
Address: Hamilton Centre for Newcomer Health
183 Hughson Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8N 2B6
Phone: (905) 526-0000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rodgers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 100722 ) Dr. G. Rodgers (CPSO#: 100558 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

Corporation Name: Sultan Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 100722 ) Dr. G. Rodgers (CPSO#: 100558 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Address: Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
Department of Family Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 340 York Blvd
Hamilton Ontario L8R 3L2
Phone: (905) 525-1677
Fax: 905 525 5112
Address: Hamilton Centre for Newcomer Health
183 Hughson Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8N 2B6
Phone: (905) 526-0000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rodgers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 100722 ) Dr. G. Rodgers (CPSO#: 100558 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

Corporation Name: Sultan Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 100722 ) Dr. G. Rodgers (CPSO#: 100558 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Address: Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEMMA ARIELLE RODGERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODGERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEMMA ARIELLE RODGERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODGERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013