THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:10:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6420 Beatty Line North
Unit 204
Fergus ON N1M 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-843-4380
Fax: 519-843-3211
Address: 235 Union St E
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
Phone: 518-843-2010
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graham Cummins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Cummins (CPSO#: 100560 )
Business Address: 235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
(519) 843-2010
Business Address: 801 St. David Street North
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L1
(519) 787-2940
Business Address: 6420 Beatty Line N
Fergus ON N1M 2W3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6420 Beatty Line North
Unit 204
Fergus ON N1M 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-843-4380
Fax: 519-843-3211
Address: 235 Union St E
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
Phone: 518-843-2010
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graham Cummins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Cummins (CPSO#: 100560 )
Business Address: 235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
(519) 843-2010
Business Address: 801 St. David Street North
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L1
(519) 787-2940
Business Address: 6420 Beatty Line N
Fergus ON N1M 2W3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAHAM JAMES CUMMINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUMMINS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAHAM JAMES CUMMINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUMMINS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013