THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:16:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Gesamthochschule Essen, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated
Health and Wellness
20 Lynch St
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 17 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michal Piotrowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Piotrowski (CPSO#: 100563 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wel
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Gesamthochschule Essen, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated
Health and Wellness
20 Lynch St
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 17 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michal Piotrowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Piotrowski (CPSO#: 100563 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wel
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAL ADAM PIOTROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIOTROWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAL ADAM PIOTROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIOTROWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Gesamthochschule Essen, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013