THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:41:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Bridgepoint Drive
Hennick Bridgepoint Hospital
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
Phone: (416) 461-8252
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessica Fong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fong (CPSO#: 100601 )
Business Address: William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Bridgepoint Drive
Hennick Bridgepoint Hospital
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
Phone: (416) 461-8252
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessica Fong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fong (CPSO#: 100601 )
Business Address: William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013