THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:36:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Health
89 Norman St
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-464-4400
Extension: 5517
Fax: 519-383-8532

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 17 Nov 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Lebert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lebert (CPSO#: 100624 )
Business Address: 89 Norman St
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
5194644400 Extn: 5517

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Health
89 Norman St
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-464-4400
Extension: 5517
Fax: 519-383-8532

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 17 Nov 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Lebert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lebert (CPSO#: 100624 )
Business Address: 89 Norman St
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
5194644400 Extn: 5517

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE MARIE LEBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBERT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE MARIE LEBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBERT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013