THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:44:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fisher Family Primary Care Centre
185 Inkerman Street E
Listowel Ontario N4W 2P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: 519-291-5947

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gateman and Trojnar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Trojnar (CPSO#: 101258 ) Dr. D. Gateman (CPSO#: 100625 )
Business Address: Fisher Family Primary Care Centre
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2P4
(519) 291-4200
Business Address: Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2P5
(519) 291-3120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fisher Family Primary Care Centre
185 Inkerman Street E
Listowel Ontario N4W 2P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: 519-291-5947

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gateman and Trojnar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Trojnar (CPSO#: 101258 ) Dr. D. Gateman (CPSO#: 100625 )
Business Address: Fisher Family Primary Care Centre
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2P4
(519) 291-4200
Business Address: Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2P5
(519) 291-3120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK PAUL GATEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GATEMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK PAUL GATEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GATEMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013