THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:35:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 123 Rexdale Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9W 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 743-5853
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hanna (CPSO#: 100626 )
Business Address: 103 - 18 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M5E 1Z8
(647) 748-5663
Business Address: 123 Rexdale Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9W 1P1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 123 Rexdale Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9W 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 743-5853
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hanna (CPSO#: 100626 )
Business Address: 103 - 18 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M5E 1Z8
(647) 748-5663
Business Address: 123 Rexdale Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9W 1P1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE ROSALIE HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE ROSALIE HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013